05/31/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/31/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | |||
05/25/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
05/25/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3618.) | |||
05/16/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/30/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/26/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4562.) | |||
04/24/2012 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/23/2012 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 23). | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/07/2012 | From printer. | |||
03/06/2012 | Introduced. To print. |