05/03/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/03/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:45 p.m. | |||
04/26/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
04/26/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3292.) | |||
04/10/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/09/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4247.) | |||
03/29/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (March 29). | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/13/2012 | From printer. | |||
03/12/2012 | Introduced. To print. |