LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR128
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR128
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR128
Action History
08/29/2012
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Allen.
05/08/2012
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (May 8).
03/22/2012
Referred to Com. on JUD.
03/14/2012
From printer.
03/13/2012
Introduced. To print.