09/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/08/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
09/08/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2383.) | |||
08/31/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/01/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/28/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 453.) | |||
02/18/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 18). | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/02/2011 | From printer. | |||
02/01/2011 | Introduced. To print. |