05/09/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/09/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12 p.m. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
05/03/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3405.) | |||
04/26/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/26/2012 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4569.) | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19). | |||
04/18/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/21/2012 | From printer. | |||
03/20/2012 | Introduced. To print. |