California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR133 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 05/09/2012

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 133CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 18 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 9, 2012 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 3, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 17, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Pan (Coauthor: Senator Lieu) MARCH 20, 2012 Relative to Taiwanese American Heritage Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 133, Pan. Taiwanese American Heritage Week. This measure would proclaim that the Legislature joins Taiwanese communities throughout the state in celebrating Taiwanese American Heritage Week. This measure would declare that warm relations and bilateral exchange between the people of California and Taiwan should grow. This measure would state that the Legislature supports the goals of Taiwanese American Heritage Week and recognizes the profound importance of Taiwanese Americans to California. WHEREAS, May 2012, will mark the 14th annual Taiwanese American Heritage Week national celebration; and WHEREAS, President Bill Clinton first acknowledged, in a letter to the Taiwanese community in May 1999, the celebration of Taiwanese American Heritage Week during the first week of May; and WHEREAS, The annual Taiwanese American Heritage Week celebration creates awareness of the contributions of Taiwanese Americans; and WHEREAS, The recognition of Taiwanese American Heritage Week promotes shared community among different generations of Taiwanese Americans in California; and WHEREAS, The Taiwanese American community strongly supports democracy, human rights, and the rule of law; and WHEREAS, Taiwanese Americans are committed to the principles of freedom, justice, and democracy; and WHEREAS, Frequent exchanges, including exchanges at the highest level of government, contribute to broadening the friendship and cooperation between California and Taiwan; and WHEREAS, Taiwanese Americans have contributed greatly to scientific, technological, and business advancements that have helped to shape our state and the world, including notable Taiwanese Americans such as Chief Technology Officer of YouTube Steven Chen, California Supreme Court Justice Goodwin Liu, and cofounder of Yahoo Jeremy Yang; and WHEREAS, Taiwanese Americans have also contributed greatly to the arts, entertainment, and humanitarian endeavors that have impacted and shaped the social fabric of our state and nation, including Academy Award winning film director Ang Lee, journalists Lisa and Laura Ling, National Basketball Association phenom, Jeremy Lin; and WHEREAS, The United States and Taiwan share common ideals and a vision for a healthy, peaceful, and democratic 21st century; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature joins Taiwanese communities throughout the state in celebrating Taiwanese American Heritage Week; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature declares that the warm relations and bilateral exchange between the people of California and Taiwan should grow; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature supports the goals of Taiwanese American Heritage Week and recognizes the profound importance of Taiwanese Americans to California; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.