06/07/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/07/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |||
06/04/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/04/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3766.) | |||
05/30/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/30/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/26/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4560.) | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19). | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/21/2012 | From printer. | |||
03/20/2012 | Introduced. To print. |