06/01/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 40, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/01/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
05/30/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
05/29/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3659.) | |||
05/09/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/17/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/16/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4368.) | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |||
04/10/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
03/26/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2012 | From printer. | |||
03/21/2012 | Introduced. To print. |