LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR138
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR138
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR138
Compare Versions
ACR138 Chaptered May 3, 2012
ACR138 Enrolled April 27, 2012
ACR138 Amended April 16, 2012
ACR138 Amended April 9, 2012
ACR138 Introduced March 22, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
ACR138 Chaptered May 3, 2012
ACR138 Enrolled April 27, 2012
ACR138 Amended April 16, 2012
ACR138 Amended April 9, 2012
ACR138 Introduced March 22, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare