05/24/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/24/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |||
05/21/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
05/21/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 1. Page 3558.) | |||
05/02/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/23/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/19/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4453.) | |||
04/16/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 16). | |||
04/13/2012 | From printer. | |||
04/12/2012 | Introduced. To print. |