08/16/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/16/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:50 p.m. | |||
08/09/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/09/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4447.) | |||
06/15/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/14/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 25). | |||
04/23/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/18/2012 | From printer. | |||
04/17/2012 | Introduced. To print. |