California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR146 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 06/01/2012

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 146CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 41 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JUNE 1, 2012 ADOPTED IN SENATE MAY 29, 2012 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 7, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Lara (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Atkins, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Bradford, Buchanan, Butler, Charles Calderon, Campos, Carter, Cedillo, Cook, Davis, Dickinson, Eng, Feuer, Fong, Beth Gaines, Garrick, Gatto, Gordon, Gorell, Grove, Hagman, Halderman, Harkey, Hayashi, Roger Hernndez, Hill, Huber, Hueso, Jeffries, Jones, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Mendoza, Miller, Mitchell, Monning, Morrell, Nestande, Nielsen, Olsen, Pan, Perea, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Silva, Skinner, Smyth, Solorio, Swanson, Torres, Valadao, Wagner, Wieckowski, Williams, and Yamada) APRIL 23, 2012 Relative to Cinco de Mayo Week. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 146, Lara. Cinco de Mayo Week. This measure would proclaim May 1 through May 7, 2012, as Cinco de Mayo Week, and would urge all Californians to join in celebrating Cinco de Mayo. WHEREAS, Cinco de Mayo, or the fifth of May, is memorialized as a significant date in the history of California and Mexico in recognition of the Latinos of California who offered their support and risked their lives to defend freedom and democracy in both the United States and Mexico; and WHEREAS, Since the beginning of the American Civil War, Latinos in California showed their support for the institutions of freedom and democracy by joining the forces of the United States Army, Cavalry, and Navy, risking their lives to defend free institutions; and WHEREAS, Those who were unable to join the Armed Forces of the Union, freely offered their support for United States President Abraham Lincoln; and WHEREAS, The American Civil War, making it impossible for the United States to enforce the Monroe Doctrine, provided an opportunity for the Emperor of the French, Napolon III, to establish a monarchy in Mexico, thereby attempting to destroy democratic institutions that derive their power from the consent of the governed; and WHEREAS, Latinos, including Californios, also offered their support and risked their lives in Mexico to defend freedom and democracy in that country by joining the armed forces of that sister republic; and WHEREAS, Those who were unable to travel to Mexico to physically defend free institutions, freely offered their support to President Benito Juarez by organizing over 122 Juntas Patriticas Mejicanas within California to raise funds that were sent every month from California to Mexico to defray the costs of war in that country; and WHEREAS, Cinco de Mayo serves to remind us that the foundation of any nation and our state is in its people, in their spirit and courage in the face of adversity, in the strength of their drive to achieve self-determination, and in their willingness to sacrifice even life itself in the pursuit of freedom and liberty; and WHEREAS, Cinco de Mayo offers an opportunity to reflect on the courage and achievements not only of the Mexican forces at Puebla, but also on the courage and achievements of Latinos here in California; and WHEREAS, Achievements by Latinos in America and California include contributions to all facets of our community; and WHEREAS, Latino voters continue to go to the polls in record numbers and influence the entrance of newly elected Latino public officials in both the Democratic and Republican parties and issues ranging from affordable housing, investing in our children, ensuring that higher education is affordable and accessible, creating good paying jobs for working families, and improving the overall quality of life for all Californians; and WHEREAS, California's Latinos have contributed to our culture and society through their many achievements in music, food, dance, poetry, literature, architecture, entertainment, sports, and across a broad spectrum of artistic expression; and WHEREAS, In 2001, the Latino Caucus saw a need to recognize and honor distinguished Latinos for their contributions and dedication to California and the United States' economy and cultural life with the annual Latino Spirit Awards. These recipients are outstanding individuals who have greatly contributed to the wonderful music, poetry, literature, journalism, and entertainment of California, the United States, and the world; and WHEREAS, Latinos in California have challenged the frontiers of social and economic justice, thereby improving the working conditions and lives of countless Californians; and WHEREAS, Latino entrepreneurs in the United States are the fastest growing group of business owners in our economy; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature urges all Californians to join in celebrating Cinco de Mayo, the historic day to honor the brave spirit of Latinos from California who defended freedom and democracy in the United States during the Civil War and in Mexico during the French Intervention, and the Latino noncombatants who freely gave their votes and resources to defend free institutions, and the Latinos of California who fought to defend the freedom of the United States in every armed conflict since the Spanish American War to the current conflicts in Iraq and Afghanistan; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature declares May 1 through May 7, 2012, as Cinco de Mayo Week; and be it further Resolved, That special mention be made that this year is the 150th anniversary of the Battle of Puebla; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.