05/25/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). | |||
05/23/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/22/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Amended. | |||
05/16/2012 | Amended. | |||
05/15/2012 | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (May 8). | |||
05/03/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
05/02/2012 | From printer. | |||
05/01/2012 | Introduced. To print. |