05/31/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2012. | |||
05/31/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. | |||
05/25/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
05/25/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3620.) | |||
05/15/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/14/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4807.) | |||
05/10/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 10). | |||
05/08/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/07/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
05/03/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/02/2012 | From printer. | |||
05/01/2012 | Introduced. To print. |