08/21/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 83, Statutes of 2012. | |||
08/21/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12 p.m. | |||
08/13/2012 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Page 5894.). | |||
08/09/2012 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
08/09/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4447.) | |||
08/06/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/29/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/25/2012 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 4982.) | |||
05/17/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 17). | |||
05/10/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/02/2012 | From printer. | |||
05/01/2012 | Introduced. To print. |