09/18/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 131, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/18/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m. | |||
08/30/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/30/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5025.) | |||
08/29/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/22/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/22/2012 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 6133.) | |||
08/16/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
08/15/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Amended. | |||
08/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/06/2012 | Amended. | |||
07/05/2012 | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (July 3). | |||
06/18/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
06/14/2012 | From printer. | |||
06/13/2012 | Introduced. To print. |