LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR162
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR162
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR162
Action History
08/15/2012
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
08/07/2012
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
08/06/2012
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Amended.
07/02/2012
Referred to Com. on ED.
06/21/2012
From printer.
06/20/2012
Introduced. To print.