09/18/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/18/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m. | |||
08/31/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/31/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5049.) | |||
08/30/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/21/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/20/2012 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6007.) | |||
08/16/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 16). | |||
08/15/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Amended. | |||
08/14/2012 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/13/2012 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5866.) | |||
08/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
08/07/2012 | From printer. | |||
08/06/2012 | Introduced. To print. |