California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR165 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/15/2012

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 165AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 15, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Fletcher  (   Principal coauthor:   Assembly Member   Block   )   (   Coauthors:   Assembly Members   Atkins,   Garrick,   Hueso,   and Jones   )   (   Coauthors:   Senators   Anderson,   Kehoe,   Vargas,   and Wyland   )  AUGUST 6, 2012 Relative to  the Chelsea King Memorial Bridge.   transportation facility designations.  LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 165, as amended, Fletcher. Chelsea King Memorial Bridge  and the Amber Dubois Memorial Highway  . This measure would  (1)  designate a specified bridge on State Highway Route 15 in San Diego County as the Chelsea King Memorial Bridge  , and (2) designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 78 as the Amber Dubois Memorial Highway  . The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing  this   these  special  designation   designations  and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes. WHEREAS, Chelsea King, a 17-year-old Poway High School student, disappeared after going for a run in Rancho Bernardo Park in San Diego County on February 25, 2010; and WHEREAS, After a search by law enforcement and thousands of citizen search volunteers, Chelsea King's body was found near Lake  Hodges, and it   Hodges. It  was determined  that, tragically,  her life had been  tragically  taken by a violent sex offender; and  WHEREAS, Amber Dubois, a 14-year-old Escondido High School student, disappeared on her way to school the morning of February 13, 2009; and   WHEREAS, After an intensive search by law enforcement, friends, and family across Southern California, Amber Dubois' body was found near Pala. It was determined that, tragically, her life had been taken by a violent sex offender; and  WHEREAS, A man who was convicted of violently molesting a 13-year-old in 2000, but was freed after only five years in prison, has pled guilty to  the crime;   both crimes;  and WHEREAS, Chelsea King will always be remembered by her community for her compassionate heart and positive spirit, whether for helping plan a prom for developmentally disabled youth, packing relief boxes for those in need in Africa, or serving as a peer counselor at her school; and WHEREAS, Chelsea King was an avid cross country runner, a gifted student, and a loving daughter and sister, whose life was untimely and tragically ended; and  WHEREAS, Amber Dubois will always be remembered by her community for her kind and compassionate heart and strong love of animals, especially wolves, whether for her desire to raise a lamb or her active involvement in Future Farmers of America; and   WHEREAS, Amber Dubois was a stellar student with straight As and perfect attendance, a voracious reader, and a loving daughter and sister, whose life was untimely and tragically ended; and  WHEREAS, It is therefore appropriate to designate the State Highway Route 15 (Interstate 15) bridge over Lake Hodges in  the County of  San Diego  County  in the memory of Chelsea King  , and to designate the portion of State Highway Route 78 between Old Milky Way and West Zoo Road, alongside the San Diego Zoo Safari Park, in the County of San Diego in the memory of Amber Dubois  ; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the State Highway Route 15 (Interstate 15) bridge over Lake Hodges in  the County of  San Diego  County  is hereby designated as the Chelsea King Memorial Bridge; and be it further  Resolved, That the portion of State Highway Route 78 between Old Milky Way and West Zoo Road, in the County of San Diego, is hereby designated as the Amber Dubois Memorial Highway; and be it further  Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is hereby requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing  this   each of these  special  designation   designations  and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.