09/04/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/04/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. | |||
08/22/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/22/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 8. Page 4715.) | |||
08/21/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/20/2012 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 6006.) | |||
08/16/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 16). | |||
08/15/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
08/14/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | |||
08/09/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. | |||
08/08/2012 | From printer. | |||
08/07/2012 | Introduced. To print. |