09/18/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 136, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/18/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m. | |||
08/29/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/29/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4950.) | |||
08/28/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/22/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/22/2012 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6148.) | |||
08/20/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 20). | |||
08/16/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/15/2012 | From printer. | |||
08/14/2012 | Introduced. To print. |