04/06/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 11, Statutes of 2011. | |||
04/06/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
04/04/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
04/04/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 519.) | |||
03/31/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/21/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/17/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 615.) | |||
03/14/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 14). | |||
03/10/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/09/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
02/24/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/09/2011 | From printer. | |||
02/08/2011 | Introduced. To print. |