LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR19
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR19
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR19
Action History
02/23/2011
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
02/22/2011
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 412.)
02/18/2011
Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 18).
02/15/2011
From printer.
02/14/2011
Introduced. To print.