09/18/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 127, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/18/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m. | |||
08/29/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/29/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4949.) | |||
08/28/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/22/2012 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
08/22/2012 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6134.) | |||
08/21/2012 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/16/2012 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |||
08/08/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/07/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
08/06/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/17/2011 | From printer. | |||
02/16/2011 | Introduced. To print. |