04/25/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2011. | |||
04/25/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |||
04/14/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
04/14/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 655.) | |||
03/15/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/14/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 543.) | |||
03/10/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 10). | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. To print. |