California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR24 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/03/2011

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 24CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 15 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE MAY 3, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE APRIL 28, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 4, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 4, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 21, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hall (Coauthors: Assembly Members Achadjian, Alejo, Allen, Ammiano, Atkins, Beall, Bill Berryhill, Block, Blumenfield, Bonilla, Bradford, Brownley, Buchanan, Butler, Charles Calderon, Carter, Cedillo, Conway, Cook, Davis, Dickinson, Donnelly, Eng, Feuer, Fletcher, Fong, Fuentes, Furutani, Galgiani, Garrick, Gatto, Gordon, Grove, Hagman, Halderman, Harkey, Hayashi, Roger Hernndez, Hill, Huber, Hueso, Huffman, Jeffries, Jones, Lara, Bonnie Lowenthal, Ma, Mansoor, Mendoza, Miller, Mitchell, Monning, Morrell, Nestande, Nielsen, Olsen, Pan, Perea, John A. Prez, V. Manuel Prez, Silva, Solorio, Swanson, Torres, Valadao, Wagner, Wieckowski, Williams, and Yamada) FEBRUARY 17, 2011 Relative to Child Abuse Prevention Month. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 24, Hall. Child Abuse Prevention Month. This measure would acknowledge the month of April 2011 as Child Abuse Prevention Month, and encourage the people of the State of California to work together to support youth-serving child abuse prevention activities in their communities and schools. WHEREAS, Child abuse and neglect continue to pose a serious threat to our nation's children; and WHEREAS, Child abuse and neglect is a community problem and finding solutions depends on the involvement of people throughout the community; and WHEREAS, All victims of child abuse, whether physical, sexual, or emotional, should have access to a safe place to live, appropriate medical care, and counseling or mental health services; and WHEREAS, Parents, guardians, family members, foster care providers, child care providers, educators, law enforcement personnel, medical professionals, mental health professionals, social service providers, and the public all play an important role in working collaboratively to prevent child abuse and neglect; and WHEREAS, In recent years, Prevent Child Abuse America, the California chapter and other local affiliates, United States military bases, and other groups have organized Blue Ribbon Campaigns to increase public awareness of child abuse and to promote ways to prevent child abuse; and WHEREAS, Prevent Child Abuse America, in all its forms, has proclaimed April as National Child Abuse Prevention Month; and WHEREAS, Blue ribbons are displayed to increase awareness of child abuse and as a strategy for Child Abuse Prevention Month; and WHEREAS, The flexibility of this program offers numerous opportunities to be innovative and to create partnerships within business, professional, and community organizations; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature does hereby acknowledge the month of April 2011 as Child Abuse Prevention Month, and encourage the people of the State of California to work together to support youth-serving child abuse prevention activities in their communities and schools during that month and throughout the year; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.