04/13/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2011. | |||
04/13/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:20 p.m. | |||
04/11/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
04/11/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 597.) | |||
04/06/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/29/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/25/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 699.) | |||
03/22/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. | |||
02/18/2011 | From printer. | |||
02/17/2011 | Introduced. To print. |