06/08/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/08/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | |||
06/06/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/06/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1306.) | |||
04/13/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
03/25/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/25/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 701.) | |||
03/17/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17). | |||
03/16/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/15/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
03/03/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/25/2011 | From printer. | |||
02/24/2011 | Introduced. To print. |