06/07/2012 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Corbett. | |||
05/23/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/17/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/16/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1387.) | |||
05/10/2011 | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/09/2011 | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
01/24/2011 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon. | |||
01/18/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 18). | |||
01/07/2011 | From printer. | |||
01/06/2011 | Introduced. To print. |