California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR32 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/28/2011

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 32CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 64 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 28, 2011 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 28, 2011 ADOPTED IN SENATE JULY 14, 2011 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 2, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Harkey MARCH 7, 2011 Relative to child sexual abuse. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 32, Harkey. Child sexual abuse awareness. This measure would declare April 29, 2011, as the day of the annual TAALK-a-Thon sponsored by Talk About Abuse to Liberate Kids (TAALK), and would encourage all adults in California to be knowledgeable and outspoken about the prevention of child sexual abuse. WHEREAS, Child sexual abuse affects over 20 percent of minors. One in three girls and one in six boys will be victims of sexual abuse before they are 18 years of age; and WHEREAS, We know that child sexual abuse is both predictable and preventable for more than 90 percent of victims who are abused by a family member or another person the victim knows and trusts; and WHEREAS, Children are the most valuable and vulnerable members of society, and child sexual abuse is an epidemic that threatens their health, safety, and well-being; and WHEREAS, Survivors of child sexual abuse often suffer long-term physical, emotional, and social effects, including substance abuse, eating disorders, anxiety and depression, increased disease, and even early death; and WHEREAS, To ensure the safety of children, knowledgeable and outspoken adults are needed, and education and awareness programs provide communities with the knowledge and tools necessary to help prevent future abuse; and WHEREAS, Talk About Abuse to Liberate Kids (TAALK) is California's leading nonprofit organization dedicated to education, awareness, and support for victims and families, which are, in part, realized through a global TAALK-a-Thon that takes place annually, in conjunction with Sexual Abuse Awareness Month, in April; and WHEREAS, The TAALK-a-Thon provides opportunities for education, forums for awareness, and opportunities for individuals to share their stories and voice their concerns, and to begin statewide, nationwide, and worldwide discussions about the tragedy, resolution, and healing of child sexual abuse; and WHEREAS, Bringing people together to talk about child sexual abuse and prevention not only provides widespread education, but empowers survivors to break the silence and begin to heal; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature declares April 29, 2011, as the day of the annual TAALK-a-Thon sponsored by TAALK; and be it further Resolved, That the Legislature encourages all adults in California to be knowledgeable and outspoken about the prevention of child sexual abuse; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.