|
08/23/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 73, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2011
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:20 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2442.).
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1865.)
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/06/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 1439.)
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
03/07/2011
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|