07/11/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/11/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | |||
07/01/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
07/01/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1684.) | |||
06/22/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/17/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/16/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1374.) | |||
05/05/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 5). | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/11/2011 | From printer. | |||
03/10/2011 | Introduced. To print. |