06/13/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/13/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |||
06/09/2011 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1901.). | |||
06/06/2011 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
06/06/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1306.) | |||
06/01/2011 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/31/2011 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 25). | |||
05/10/2011 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on RLS. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/14/2011 | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and RLS. | |||
03/25/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/25/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 699.) | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 17). | |||
03/15/2011 | From printer. | |||
03/14/2011 | Introduced. To print. |