05/04/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2011. | |||
05/04/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | |||
05/02/2011 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1173.). Measure version as amended on April 11 corrected. | |||
04/14/2011 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
04/14/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 653.) | |||
04/13/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/11/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/15/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/14/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 315.) | |||
02/03/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 3). | |||
01/27/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/12/2011 | From printer. | |||
01/11/2011 | Introduced. To print. |