04/27/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2011. | |||
04/27/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. | |||
04/25/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
04/25/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 709.) | |||
04/13/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/05/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/04/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 813.) | |||
03/31/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 31). | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2011 | From printer. | |||
03/21/2011 | Introduced. To print. |