06/30/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 42, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/30/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
06/27/2011 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 2073.). | |||
06/23/2011 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
06/23/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1534.) | |||
06/22/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/16/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
06/06/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/02/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1777.) | |||
06/01/2011 | Read and amended. (Page 1690.) | |||
05/09/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/22/2011 | From printer. | |||
03/21/2011 | Introduced. To print. |