LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACR44
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACR44
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACR44
Action History
05/02/2011
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
04/28/2011
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1129.)
04/26/2011
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
04/25/2011
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 25).
04/07/2011
Referred to Com. on RLS.
04/05/2011
From printer.
04/04/2011
Introduced. To print.