06/21/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 34, Statutes of 2011. | |||
06/21/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 12:40 p.m. | |||
06/13/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/13/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0.) | |||
05/25/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/12/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
04/11/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 909.) | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 7). | |||
04/05/2011 | From printer. | |||
04/04/2011 | Introduced. To print. |