|
06/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 44, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3767.)
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3995.)
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 8).
|
|
|
|
03/07/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/06/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|