07/18/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 57, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/18/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
07/11/2011 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2248.). | |||
07/07/2011 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
07/07/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1750.) | |||
06/30/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/29/2011 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
06/22/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/19/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/19/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 1448.) | |||
05/09/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |||
04/28/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/13/2011 | From printer. | |||
04/12/2011 | Introduced. To print. |