|
09/28/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2011
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2011
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2859.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2011
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2131.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2011
|
Measure version as amended on August 15 corrected.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1492.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From printer.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|