09/06/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 80, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/06/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
08/25/2011 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 2572.). | |||
08/22/2011 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
08/22/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 2010.) | |||
08/16/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/15/2011 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
07/06/2011 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
07/05/2011 | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 28). | |||
06/16/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
06/16/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/16/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 1977.) | |||
06/13/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (June 13). | |||
06/09/2011 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (June 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/06/2011 | From printer. | |||
05/05/2011 | Introduced. To print. |