09/28/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/28/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
09/09/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
09/08/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2428.) | |||
07/11/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
07/11/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 2262.) | |||
07/06/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (July 6). | |||
06/28/2011 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
05/11/2011 | From printer. | |||
05/10/2011 | Introduced. To print. |