08/23/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 74, Statutes of 2011. | |||
08/23/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:20 p.m. | |||
08/18/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/18/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1969.) | |||
06/01/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/27/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
05/26/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1562.) | |||
05/23/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 23). | |||
05/12/2011 | From printer. | |||
05/11/2011 | Introduced. To print. |