03/11/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2011. | |||
03/11/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:15 p.m. | |||
03/07/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
03/07/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 296.) | |||
02/23/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
01/25/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
01/24/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. | |||
01/18/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 18). | |||
01/13/2011 | From printer. | |||
01/12/2011 | Introduced. To print. |