08/23/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 75, Statutes of 2011. | |||
08/23/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:20 p.m. | |||
08/18/2011 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2442.). | |||
07/14/2011 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |||
07/14/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1865.) | |||
07/11/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/21/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/20/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 1996.) | |||
06/13/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |||
05/23/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/17/2011 | From printer. | |||
05/16/2011 | Introduced. To print. |