06/25/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 59, Statutes of 2012. | |||
06/25/2012 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m. | |||
06/18/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/18/2012 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 3957.) | |||
05/23/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
07/01/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
07/01/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2163.) | |||
06/27/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). | |||
06/22/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/21/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
05/23/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/18/2011 | From printer. | |||
05/17/2011 | Introduced. To print. |