09/06/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/06/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | |||
08/29/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/29/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2087.) | |||
07/05/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
07/01/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2159.) | |||
06/20/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). | |||
06/16/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/15/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | |||
06/02/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/24/2011 | From printer. | |||
05/23/2011 | Introduced. To print. |