07/18/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 58, Statutes of 2011. | |||
07/18/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:45 p.m. | |||
07/11/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
07/11/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1782.) | |||
07/07/2011 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/27/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
06/23/2011 | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 2050.) | |||
06/20/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). | |||
06/09/2011 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/27/2011 | From printer. | |||
05/26/2011 | Introduced. To print. |