09/22/2011 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 99, Statutes of 2011. | |||
09/22/2011 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |||
09/01/2011 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/31/2011 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 2197.) | |||
08/30/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/29/2011 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |||
08/24/2011 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
08/15/2011 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
07/11/2011 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | |||
07/11/2011 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 2249.) | |||
07/06/2011 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (July 6). | |||
06/28/2011 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/16/2011 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
06/06/2011 | From printer. | |||
06/03/2011 | Introduced. To print. |